Our Governors
Welcome to our Governors’ section
Role of the Governing Board
The role of a governor is to contribute to the work of the Governing Board in ensuring high standard of achievement for all children.
The main responsibilities of a governor
- As part of a team:
- Setting the strategic direction of the school;
- Holding the leadership to account for the performance of the school;
- Making sure that resources are used well for the needs of the children.
The Governing Board is made up of:
- Co-opted Governors (appointed by the Directors)
- Parent Governors (elected by parents)
- Staff Governors (elected by staff)
Please find below details of how our Governing body is structured, including the names, positions, responsibilities and terms of appointment for each Governor.
The Governors can be contacted at any time via a sealed envelope and delivered to Ms Y Wakefield, Leigh Trust, 104 Naseby Road, Alum Rock, Birmingham, B8 3HG
Meet our Governors
Last updated 7th June 2024
Name | Position | Date of Appointment | Term of Office | Responsibility | Year Group Responsibility | Appointed by | Governance Role in other educational institutions | Business and Financial interests |
MrsRazia Ali | Executive Head Teacher | 07/10/2019 | N/A | Wyndcliffe Primary School | ||||
Mrs Ruksana Kauser | Head of School | 01.09.2022 | N/A | Health & safety | ||||
Miss Lucy Steveton | Staff | 10/06/2024 | 4 years | None Declared | ||||
Ian Potter | Chair | 22/09/2022 | 4 years |
PupilPremium Safeguarding Wellbeing |
Trustees | Works at Nansen Primary School | ||
Chloe Stamp | Co-opted | 17/07/2023 | 4 years | TBC | Trustees | Works at Yenton Primary School | ||
Kirsty Pollard | Co-opted | 23/10/2023 | 4 years | TBC | Trustees | Works at Wyndcliffe Primary School | ||
Felicia Akotuah | Co-opted | 23/10/2023 | 4 years | TBC | Trustees | Works at Wyndcliffe Primary School | ||
Marie Carmicheal | Co-opted | 16/07/2024 | 4 yeard | TBC | Trustees | TBC | ||
Sulaiman Iqbal | Parent Governor | 09/12/2022 | 4 years | Parental Engagement | Parents | None declared | ||
Vacancy | Parent | |||||||
Mrs Charlotte Taft | Governance Professional | 01.09.2022 | N/A | Link to Governor training | Attingham Education | |||
RESIGNATIONS Date within last 12 months |
Date of Resignation/End of Term | |||||||
Mr Robert Cummins | Co-opted | 27.09.2023 | ||||||
Rukhsana Kabal | Co-opted | 11.10.2023 | ||||||
Hasnat Minhas | Co-opted | 12.10.2023 | ||||||
Shahnaz Rahman | Staff |
03.03.2024 term of office ends |
Attendance Records
SEPTEMBER 2023 – JULY 2024
NAME | ATTENDANCE |
Ruksana Kauser - Head of School | 3/3 |
Razia Ali - Executive Head Teacher | 3/3 |
Hasnat Minhas - Co-opted | 0/1 |
Ian Potter - Co-opted | 3/3 |
Chloe Stamp - Co-opted | 0/3 |
Felicia Akotuah | 1/1 |
Kirsty Pollard | 1/1 |
Suliman Iqbal - Parent | 2/3 |
Mahnaz Rouf - Associate | 2/2 |
Shahnaz Rahman - Associate | 2/2 |
Shahnaz Rahman - Staff End of term of office 03.03.2024 |
1/1 |
Click below for more information about Leigh Trust